This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 12:19:52 (UTC).

CARL GORDON VS REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 CARL GORDON filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5809

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

GORDON CARL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA LOS ANGELES THE

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GERMANO CYNTHIA M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF ROBERT BALDRIDGE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF RESPONDENT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TO PETITIONER CARL GORDON'S OPENING BRIEF

8/29/2018: DECLARATION OF ROBERT BALDRIDGE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF RESPONDENT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TO PETITIONER CARL GORDON'S OPENING BRIEF

RESPONSE JUDGE AMY HOGUE'S PROFFER WITH RESPECT TO THE QUESTION OF THE NEED (AS PETITIONER IN PRO PER) TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF

8/30/2018: RESPONSE JUDGE AMY HOGUE'S PROFFER WITH RESPECT TO THE QUESTION OF THE NEED (AS PETITIONER IN PRO PER) TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF

MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

8/30/2018: MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

9/5/2018: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Minute Order

10/4/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/4/2018: Unknown

Ex Parte Application

12/4/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

2/28/2019: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

10/14/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

Proof of Service

10/24/2016: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF HOWARD B. GOLDS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PETITIONER CARL GORDON'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION

12/9/2016: DECLARATION OF HOWARD B. GOLDS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PETITIONER CARL GORDON'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION

DECLARATION OF CARL GORDON IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF RESPONDENTS

3/9/2017: DECLARATION OF CARL GORDON IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF RESPONDENTS

RESPONDENTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION

3/15/2017: RESPONDENTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/15/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

5/26/2017: Minute Order

PETITIONER CARL GORDON?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/22/2017: PETITIONER CARL GORDON?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • at 09:32 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Notice of Default (NOA 12/21/18); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B294766); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:12/21/18 B294766); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 86; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (of Petitioner Carl Gordon For a Stay of This Action); Filed by Carl Gordon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
128 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Carl Gordon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Carl Gordon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH PUBLIC RECORDS ACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BS165809    Hearing Date: November 20, 2020    Dept: 86

GORDON v. REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Case No. BS165809

Hearing Date: November 20, 2020

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Petitioner, Carl Gordon, moves this court to reconsider its judgment of June 18, 2020 pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 1008, subdivision (a). Respondent, Regents of the University of California, opposes the motion.

The motion is denied.

ANALYSIS

After hearing argument in this matter on September 4, 2019, the court entered judgment in this matter on June 18, 2020. (The judgment largely favored Petitioner.) Petitioner now requests this court reconsider (overturn and revoke) its judgment based on Petitioner’s health condition. Petitioner contends his illness “prejudiced his case and his ability to prevail on the merits of the case.” Petitioner seeks relief through Code of Civil Procedure section 1008, subdivision (a).

Code of Civil Procedure section 1008, subdivision (a) allows a court to reconsider orders—not judgments. The judgment here is final.

Moreover, even assuming the court did have the authority to take the action Petitioner requests, the court ruled from the bench in this matter on September 4, 2020. Nothing in the court’s file suggests Petitioner was suffering from his health condition on the date the court heard and decided this matter. (See Petitioner’s motion for reconsideration filed September 16, 2020.)

CONCLUSION

Based on the foregoing, the motion is denied.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

November 20, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Mitchell Beckloff

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BOARD OF REGENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERMANO CYNTHIA M. ESQ.