This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2022 at 05:10:30 (UTC).

CARITAS HOME HEALTH PROVIDERS INC VS KHASHYAR ESHRAGHI

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 CARITAS HOME HEALTH PROVIDERS INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against KHASHYAR ESHRAGHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2916

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARITAS HOME HEALTH PROVIDERS INC.

Defendant

ESHRAGHI KHASHYAR DEFAULTED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOM TRACEY P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

9/7/2016: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MALPRACTICE; ETC

9/7/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MALPRACTICE; ETC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/13/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/13/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MALPRACTICE 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY 3. BREACH OF CONTRACT

9/14/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MALPRACTICE 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY 3. BREACH OF CONTRACT

MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION; DECLARATION OF TRACEY P. HOM

9/14/2016: MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION; DECLARATION OF TRACEY P. HOM

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/14/2016: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

9/20/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/21/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/4/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

1/11/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

Minute Order -

1/17/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/7/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

3/8/2017: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

3/23/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

4/17/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/23/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

5/23/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2017

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Discharged) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketDECLARATION OF DEBORAH HATCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST KHASHAYAR ESHRAGHI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketDECLARATION OF TRACEY HOM IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST KHASHAYAR ESHRAGHI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketOrder; Filed by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketREQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketSTATEMENT OF THE CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketRULING RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2017

DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Caritas HOme Health Providers, Inc. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
09/14/2016

DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MALPRACTICE 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY 3. BREACH OF CONTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2016

DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2016

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2016

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2016

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2016

DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2016

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. MALPRACTICE; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2016

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2016

DocketComplaint; Filed by Caritas HOme Health Providers, Inc. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2016

DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less