This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 08:48:06 (UTC).

CANICO CAPITAL GROUP LLC ET AL VS MICHAEL GALAM ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/15/2015 CANICO CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL GALAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9556

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CANICO CAPITAL GROUP LLC

INDUSTRIAL ROAD 2440-2497 LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

FERRARIS STEVE

GALAM MICHAEL

GALAM MIKE

KAYE RON

RHINO BARE PROJECTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MIRMAN BUBMAN & NAHMIAS LLP

STANTON MITCHEL T. ESQ.

ZEPEDA ANDREW WILLIAM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

EDMONDSON J. CURTIS ESQ.

STEVEN MEEKS

NEGRIN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

MEEKS STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Declaration

6/13/2019: Declaration

Motion for Order

6/13/2019: Motion for Order

Substitution of Attorney

6/14/2019: Substitution of Attorney

COMPLAINT OF CANICO CAPITAL GROUP, LLC AND INDUSTRIAL ROAD 2440-2497, LLC FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

1/15/2015: COMPLAINT OF CANICO CAPITAL GROUP, LLC AND INDUSTRIAL ROAD 2440-2497, LLC FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/6/2015: AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. BC514908 WITH CASE NO. BC519196 AND CASE NO. BC569556; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MITCHEL STANTON

3/11/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. BC514908 WITH CASE NO. BC519196 AND CASE NO. BC569556; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MITCHEL STANTON

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/11/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

4/7/2015: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/13/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/20/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/4/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

RON KAYE AND STEVE FERRARIS'S / JUDGMENT CREDITORS' AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FOR FRAUDULENT CONVEYANCE AND ALTER-EGO

6/24/2015: RON KAYE AND STEVE FERRARIS'S / JUDGMENT CREDITORS' AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FOR FRAUDULENT CONVEYANCE AND ALTER-EGO

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/24/2015: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/28/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/28/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC

10/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC

Minute Order

11/17/2017: Minute Order

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Motion for Order (TO CHARGE TRANSFEREE?S INTEREST IN A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Declaration (OF ABRAHAM ASSIL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO CHARGE TRANSFEREE?S INTEREST IN A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42; (MOTION-SET ASIDE; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-11-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Reply/Response; Filed by Rhino Bare Projects LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC ' MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GALAM IN SUPPORT OF RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42; (Order ReRelated Cases; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-02-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • COMPLAINT OF CANICO CAPITAL GROUP, LLC AND INDUSTRIAL ROAD 2440-2497, LLC FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff); Industrial Road 2440-2497, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

J. Curtis Edmondson (SBN 236105) Law Offices of J. Curtis Edmondson 3699 NW John Olsen PL.

Hillsboro, OR 97124

Ph: 503-336-3749

Fax: 503-482-7418

e-Mail: jcedmondson@edmolaw.com

Attorney for RON KAYE and

STEVE FERRARIS FILED

%upériar Court of California ‘nninty nf | ne Anneles

JUN 2 4 2015

Shemi K. Carter, bxegunvg vincer/Clesk By . &5 , Deputy 0ses doto

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

CANICO CAPITAL GROUP,LLC, a California limited lability company; INDUSTRIAL ROAD 2440-2497, LLC a Nevada Limited Liability Company

Plaintiffs, VS. MICHAEL GALAM, aka MIKE GALAM, an

individual; RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC, a California limited liability company; RON

KAYE an individual, and STEVE FERRARIS,

an individual; and DOES 1-50. Defendant

RON KAYE an individual, and STEVE FERRARIS, an individual;

Cross Complainants; VSs.

| MICHAEL GALAM, aka MIKE GALAM, 1and individual; RHINO BARE PROJECTS, |LLC, a Califormia limited liability company; CANICO CAPITAL GROUP, LLC, a

: California Limited Liability Company; EL

1 MARINO, LLC, a California limited liability 1company; KNOTTING HILL, LLC, a

Case No.: BC 569556 [Consolidated with Case No. BC519196] [Consolidated with Case No. BC514598]

Assigned to the Hon. Holly Kendig, Dept 42

RON KAYE and STEVE FERRARIS’S /

JUDGMENT CREDITORS’ AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FOR FRAUDULENT

CONVEYANCE and ALTER-EGO