Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2020 at 12:07:03 (UTC).

CANADA DRY MOTT'S INC VS FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTD

Case Summary

On 05/26/2011 CANADA DRY MOTT'S INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and JOHN L. SEGAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2390

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

JOHN L. SEGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANADA DRY MOTT'S INC.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWXHURST GERALD E.

Defendant Attorney

GUNDY CHRISTOPHER VAN

 

Court Documents

FUJI WATER OF CANADA LTD.S RFPLY BRIIF IN SUPPORT OF IFS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

9/15/2011: FUJI WATER OF CANADA LTD.S RFPLY BRIIF IN SUPPORT OF IFS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

10/17/2011: Minute Order -

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ADAM P. ZAFFOS

12/16/2011: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ADAM P. ZAFFOS

DECLARATION OF GERALD E. HAWXHURST IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CANADA DRY MOTT?S INC.?S OPPOSITION TO FIJI?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTNER RESPOR4SES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

12/28/2011: DECLARATION OF GERALD E. HAWXHURST IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CANADA DRY MOTT?S INC.?S OPPOSITION TO FIJI?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTNER RESPOR4SES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTI).?S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDEI) COMPLAINT

1/4/2012: FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTI).?S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDEI) COMPLAINT

MINUTE ORDER

1/11/2012: MINUTE ORDER

STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

2/1/2012: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

COUNTERCLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

2/14/2012: COUNTERCLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

1) DEFENDANT FIJI WATKR OF CANADA LTD.?S AND PLAINTIFF CANADA DRY MOTT?S, INC.?S JOINT EX P,4RTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES 2) MEMORANI)UM OF POINT

2/14/2012: 1) DEFENDANT FIJI WATKR OF CANADA LTD.?S AND PLAINTIFF CANADA DRY MOTT?S, INC.?S JOINT EX P,4RTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES 2) MEMORANI)UM OF POINT

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT CANADA DRY MOTT'S INC.'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

4/2/2012: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT CANADA DRY MOTT'S INC.'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT CDMI'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTD.'S CROSS- COMPLAINT; ETC.

4/2/2012: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT CDMI'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTD.'S CROSS- COMPLAINT; ETC.

DEFENDANT?S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT LAS MODIFIED BY DEMURRERI

4/6/2012: DEFENDANT?S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT LAS MODIFIED BY DEMURRERI

CAL. R. CT. 3.1350(G) TABLE OF CONTENTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CANADA DRY V1OTI?S INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUI)ICATION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/25/2012: CAL. R. CT. 3.1350(G) TABLE OF CONTENTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CANADA DRY V1OTI?S INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUI)ICATION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF JEFF CLARK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF FIRST AND SECOND CAUSES OF ACTION OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/25/2012: DECLARATION OF JEFF CLARK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF FIRST AND SECOND CAUSES OF ACTION OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFNDANT FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTD.?S RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO FIJI WATER OF CANADA?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/20/2012: DEFNDANT FIJI WATER OF CANADA LTD.?S RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO FIJI WATER OF CANADA?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order -

6/27/2012: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS T. SPENCER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CANADA DRY MOTT?S INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION

7/5/2012: DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS T. SPENCER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CANADA DRY MOTT?S INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order -

7/19/2012: Minute Order -

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Canada Dry Mott's Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • Docketat 08:29 AM in Department 52; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Motion for Summary Adjudication; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Canada Dry Mott's Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Canada Dry Mott's Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUNDY, CHRISTOPHER VAN