This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 00:18:14 (UTC).

CALVIN STINNETT ET AL VS AMCORD INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2012 CALVIN STINNETT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMCORD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICK T. MADDEN, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and NO ASSIGNED. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0193

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICK T. MADDEN

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

NO ASSIGNED

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CALVIN STINNETT

DONNA STINNETT

STINNETT CALVIN

STINNETT DONNA

Defendants and Respondents

ALTA BUILDING MATERIAL CO.

AMCORD INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC INC.

CALIFORNIA AUTO STORES

CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

CALPORTLAND COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

DOES 3 THROUGH 800

FDCC CALIFORNIA INC.

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE US INC.

FREDERICK MEISWINKEL INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BRAYTON ALAN R. ESQ.

BRAYTON*PURCELL LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BASSI EDLIN HUIE & BLUM LLP

BERKES ROBERT H. ESQ.

BURNHAM BROWN

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

DUMONT RICHARD D. ESQ.

HAKE LAW A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

LOMBARDI LOPER & CONANT LLP

MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LLP

PERKINS COIE LLP

POLSNIELLI LLP

POND FRANK D. ESQ.

POPOVICH JERRY C. ESQ.

PRINDLE AMARO GOETZ HILLYARD BARNES

SEDGWICK LLP

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

WALSWORTH FRANKLIN BEVINS & MCCALL LLP

BROWN BURNHAM

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - 3RD COA AS TO UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

8/8/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - 3RD COA AS TO UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - HOPEMAN BROTHERS INC.

12/14/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - HOPEMAN BROTHERS INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - FDCC CALIFORNIA INC

1/31/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - FDCC CALIFORNIA INC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS INC.

2/7/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - LEHIGH SOUTHWEST CEMENT COMPANY

2/13/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - LEHIGH SOUTHWEST CEMENT COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - TRIMON INC.

3/10/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - TRIMON INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - AS TO DEFENDANTS LISTED ON EXHIBIT "A"; AS TO ALL ALLEGATIONS RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DEC. 5, 1980

4/30/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - AS TO DEFENDANTS LISTED ON EXHIBIT "A"; AS TO ALL ALLEGATIONS RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DEC. 5, 1980

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CALIFORNIA AUTO STORE

7/22/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CALIFORNIA AUTO STORE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PAREX USA, INC.

7/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PAREX USA, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

8/14/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

8/19/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - A/T DOES 3 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE

11/10/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - A/T DOES 3 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

12/3/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - AS TO BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.; REJECTED

3/22/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - AS TO BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.; REJECTED

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.; REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department S28; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (ALTA BUILDING MATERIAL,CO ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Crown Cork & Seal ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Frederick Meiswinkel, Inc. ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Calvin Stinnett (Plaintiff); Donna Stinnett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTA BUILDING MATERIALS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALPORTLAND COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD is a litigant