Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2016 at 14:23:57 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA PAVING & GRADING VS CULP CONSTRUCTION, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/06/2008 CALIFORNIA PAVING GRADING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CULP CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARY THORNTON HOUSE and DUDLEY W. GRAY II. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7283

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA PAVING & GRADING INC.

Defendants and Respondents

CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC

INTRACORP

KEYBANK

KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-250

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL AND BALDWIN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COTTONE EDWIN R. ESQ.

LUCE FORWARD HAMILTON & SCRIPPS LLP

KAY SCHOLER LLP

COX CASTLE & NICHOLSON LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

5/6/2008: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/19/2008: AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/9/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/25/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR : 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT , ETC

6/26/2008: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR : 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT , ETC

ANSWER OF CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY TO COMPLAINT

6/26/2008: ANSWER OF CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY TO COMPLAINT

NON SERVICE REPORT

6/26/2008: NON SERVICE REPORT

ANSWER OF CALIFORNIA PAVING & GRADING , INC. TO CROSS COMPLAINT

7/2/2008: ANSWER OF CALIFORNIA PAVING & GRADING , INC. TO CROSS COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/7/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT KEYBANKS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

7/30/2008: DEFENDANT KEYBANKS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/22/2008: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/12/2008: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

9/18/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/3/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/27/2008: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/3/2009: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

2/3/2009: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/16/2009: Minute Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2009
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S ( filed ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ON 6/26/08 WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2008
  • Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2008
  • Notice-Related Cases (R/T YC058065- DEPT B, SOUTHWEST DISTRICT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2008
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • Answer (TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF DEFT KAYBANK ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: ROBERT G.CAMPBELL,ATTY AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SVC ON BEHALF OF MANCHESTER & BELFORD,LLC BY MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2008
  • Miscellaneous-Other (NON SERVICE REPORT SERVEE: MANCHESTER & BELFORD,LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CO. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2008
  • Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued (X-COMPLAINANT,CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY,A CALIF CORP, VS. X-DEFTS,CALIFORNIA PAVING & GRADING,INC.,A CORP.,MANCHESTER & BELFORD,LLC,A DELAWARE LIMITED...) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: KEYBANK,A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN BY SERVING ROBERTA FUHR,PRESIDENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: INTRACORP, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN BY SERVING PETER LAVENER,PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF...) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: CULP CONSTRUCTION CO., A UTAH CORP. BY SERVING RANDALL HALE,AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2008
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2008
  • Notice (OF PROCEEDINGS [PRIVATE WORKS] ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA PAVING AND GRADING CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KeyBank National Association is a litigant