Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2016 at 13:58:20 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA PAVING & GRADING, INC. VS. CULP CONSTRUCTION CO.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2008 CALIFORNIA PAVING GRADING, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CULP CONSTRUCTION CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN and MARY THORNTON HOUSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8065

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

 

Party Details

Defendants

PHILLIP STUPPERT

KOKI JUNGI/AHN MIJI

BARBARA L. JACKSON

JUNGI/AHN MIJI KOKI

DANIEL ABRUZZI

MASAYASU KOKI

MEDELLIN CECILIA E.

CASSMAN SCOTT M.

KOKI MASAYASU

RODNEY N. GRANT

NOELL P. GRANT

SUSAN E. STUPPERT

CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

RANT NOELL P.

SCOTT M. CASSMAN

GRANT RODNEY N.

STUPPERT PHILIPP

ALLISON AMY E.

ALLISON STUART J.

MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MACDONALD KIRK S.

GILL AND BALDWIN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MECHANICS LIEN

9/9/2008: COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MECHANICS LIEN

SUMMONS

9/10/2008: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/22/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

9/24/2008: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/24/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/24/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/24/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/24/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/25/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/29/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

10/3/2008: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/3/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NON SERVICE REPORT

10/17/2008: NON SERVICE REPORT

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/29/2008: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

Minute Order

11/19/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/26/2009: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/3/2009: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

3/16/2009: Minute Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2009
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S (filed ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. SUSAN E. STUPPERT BY PERSONAL SERV ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. MASAYASU KOKI BY PERSONAL SERV. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. STUART J. ALLISON BY PERSONAL SERV ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. CECILIA E. MEDILLIN BY PERSONAL SERV. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. JUNGI/AHN MIJI KOKI BY PERSONAL SERV. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. NOELL P. GRANT BY PERSONAL SERV. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. AMY E. ALLISON BY PERSONAL SERV. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Notice-Related Cases ( RELATED TO YC057283; WAS PENDING IN DEPT. 11 JUDGE WILLETT; SENT TO DEPT. 17 ON 7/22/08; RELATED TO BC384003 WHICH IS THE LEAD CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. RODNEY N. GRANT BY PERSONAL SERV. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. BARBARA L. JACKSON BY PERSONAL SERV. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY BY SERVING ROBERT G. CAMPBELL (ATTORNEY AUTHORIZED) ON 09/19/08) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2008
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (PARTY SERVED: ROBERT G. CAMPBELL, ATTORNEY AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE ON BEHALF OF MANCHESTER & BELFORD, LLC. SIGNED: 09/19/08 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDONALD KIRK S. ESQ.