This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2019 at 00:34:32 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA PARTS DISTRIBUTING LLC VS SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INV

Case Summary

On 09/19/2014 CALIFORNIA PARTS DISTRIBUTING LLC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8109

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CALIFORNIA PARTS DISTRIBUTING LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

HUI ANN KAI-YEE

LONG DRAGON REALTY GROUP INC.

SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY

LONG DRAGON REALTY GROUP INC

Other

SALAZAR MARGARITA ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WOLF LAW FIRM

FIRM WOLF LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FLEMING SHELDON J. ESQ.

SALAZAR MARGARITA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/31/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/18/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/12/2015: Minute Order

Unknown

3/5/2015: Unknown

NOTICE OF DEEMED PRECLUSION

4/20/2015: NOTICE OF DEEMED PRECLUSION

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/23/2015: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

JOINT WITNESS LIST

8/11/2015: JOINT WITNESS LIST

JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

8/11/2015: JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

8/11/2015: JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #1 RE: PROHIBITION OF ANY EVIDENCE WHATSOEVER RELATED TO LATE FILED SUBPOENA TO SHOWCASE.COM; SUPPORTING DECLARTION OF SHELDON J. FLEMING

8/11/2015: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #1 RE: PROHIBITION OF ANY EVIDENCE WHATSOEVER RELATED TO LATE FILED SUBPOENA TO SHOWCASE.COM; SUPPORTING DECLARTION OF SHELDON J. FLEMING

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

8/11/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

Proof of Service

8/17/2015: Proof of Service

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #1 RE: PROHIBITION OF ANY EVIDENCE WHATSOEVER RELATED TO LATE FILED SUBPOENA TO SHOWCASE.COM ON THE GROUNDS THAT THE MOTION IS: UNTIMELY, PROCEDU

8/18/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #1 RE: PROHIBITION OF ANY EVIDENCE WHATSOEVER RELATED TO LATE FILED SUBPOENA TO SHOWCASE.COM ON THE GROUNDS THAT THE MOTION IS: UNTIMELY, PROCEDU

Minute Order

8/18/2015: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

8/24/2015: PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

Minute Order

11/10/2015: Minute Order

AMENDED NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

1/27/2016: AMENDED NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order

4/26/2016: Minute Order

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 62; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 62; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 62; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by California Parts Distributing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by California Parts Distributing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by California Parts Distributing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ARISING FROM: BREACH OF CONTRACT; FRAUD; PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE; BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by California Parts Distributing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG DRAGON REALTY GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLEMING SHELDON J