This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:37:28 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ET AL VS HAWKEYE PROPERTI

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against HAWKEYE PROPERTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8625

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

CALIFORNIA STATE CONTROLLER'S OFFICE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

HAWKEYE PROPERTIES INC

PATHWAY MANAGEMENT GROUP INC

ROCKY MOUNTAIN PATHWAYS INC

OPTIONS FOR YOUTH UPLAND INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NEWMAN TARA L. DEPUTY ATTY GEN.

NEWMAN TARA LYNN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

WINICK STEVEN ESQ.

BLACKMAN BRIAN R.

KEEFE ERIN WELSH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

7/30/2019: Case Management Statement

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT HAWKEYE PROPERTIES, INC.

3/12/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT HAWKEYE PROPERTIES, INC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT PATHWAY MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.

3/12/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT PATHWAY MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT PATHWAY MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.

3/12/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT PATHWAY MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/27/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

10/2/2015: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/26/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

12/8/2015: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/2/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

9/30/2016: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE; DECLARATION OF PHILLIP J. MATSUMOTO

10/5/2016: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE; DECLARATION OF PHILLIP J. MATSUMOTO

DECLARATION OF STEVEN H. WINICK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE.

10/11/2016: DECLARATION OF STEVEN H. WINICK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE.

DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE

10/11/2016: DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

5/31/2017: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order

6/16/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/10/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

8/25/2017: Minute Order

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Status Conference (Re Status of the Options Youth Appeal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Status of the Options Youth Appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by California Department of Education (Plaintiff); California State Controller's Office California Department of Finance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hawkeye Properties, Inc. (Defendant); Pathway Management Group, Inc. (Defendant); Rocky Mountain Pathways, Inc (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Status Conference (Re Status of the Options Youth Appeal) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Steven Winick, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF DEMURRER, DEMURRER AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF HAWKEYE PROPERTIES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by California Department of Education (Plaintiff); California State Controller's Office California Department of Finance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by California Department of Education (Plaintiff); California State Controller's Office California Department of Finance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Docket2OMPLAINT FOR FRAUDULENT TRANSFER AND VIOLATION OF CORPORATIONS CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Department of Education (Plaintiff); California State Controller's Office California Department of Finance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pathway Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE CONTROLLER'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINICK, STEVEN H