This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 08:59:20 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. VS CARMEN E CANJURA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2016 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARMEN E CANJURA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4535

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC

Defendants

CANJURA CARMEN E.

MARQUEZ CARLOS

MARQUEZ CARLOS A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE FRANKLIN J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Default Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Statement of Case Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTY FEES PER 1717.5 OF THE CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Req for Entry of Court's Judgment (SUBMITTED/PROCESSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED; CARLOS MARQUEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC064535    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: E

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

(Enforcement of Judgment)

[CCP §703.520]

Date: 3/13/20

Case: California Business Bureau Inc. v. Carmen E. Canjura et al. (EC 064535)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Judgment debtor Carlos Marquez’s claim of exemption is DENIED.

Under CCP § 703.580(b), at a hearing on a claim of exemption, “the exemption claimant has the burden of proof.” In meeting this burden, the one who claims the exemption must establish the right by evidence or facts; an affidavit which merely follows the language of the statute and states nothing more than conclusions of law is insufficient. (Le Font v. Rankin (1959) 167 Cal.App.2d 433, 435.) Because judgment debtor Carlos Marquez did not provide any financial statement or statement of facts showing how his checking and savings accounts are exempt from enforcement of judgment, the claim of exemption is DENIED.