Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2020 at 20:39:04 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK VS M E R ENTERPRISES INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 08/16/2011 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against M E R ENTERPRISES INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE O'DONNELL, ANN I. JONES, ROBERT H. O'BRIEN and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7590

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE O'DONNELL

ANN I. JONES

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

M.E.R. ENTERPRISES INCORPORATED

NAHOURAY EDMOND

Others

PETTA CARL

US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORMANDIN TOM R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

8/16/2011: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT - PROMISSORY NOTE; ETC

8/16/2011: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT - PROMISSORY NOTE; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/21/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/12/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order -

12/15/2011: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT)

1/17/2012: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

1/24/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

PLAINTIFF, CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK?S NOTICE AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CARL PETTA AS RENTS RECEIVER; REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; -

1/31/2012: PLAINTIFF, CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK?S NOTICE AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CARL PETTA AS RENTS RECEIVER; REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; -

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER

2/21/2012: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER

DECLARATION OF CARL G. PETTA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

3/1/2012: DECLARATION OF CARL G. PETTA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CARL PETTA AS RECEIVER

4/6/2012: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CARL PETTA AS RECEIVER

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CARL PETTA AS RECEIVER

4/6/2012: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CARL PETTA AS RECEIVER

Minute Order -

4/16/2012: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF, CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CHARGE JUDGMENT DEBTOR?S INTERESTS IN LLC; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/19/2012: PLAINTIFF, CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CHARGE JUDGMENT DEBTOR?S INTERESTS IN LLC; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PLAINTIFF/JUDGMENT CREDITOR?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS/JUDGMENT DEBTORS? EX PARTE APPLICATION RE OBJECTION TO ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER

4/19/2012: PLAINTIFF/JUDGMENT CREDITOR?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS/JUDGMENT DEBTORS? EX PARTE APPLICATION RE OBJECTION TO ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER

EX-PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANT, M.E.R. ENTERPRISES TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE ENTRY OF ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER; DECLARATION OF H. JOSEPH NOURMAND RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE A

4/19/2012: EX-PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANT, M.E.R. ENTERPRISES TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE ENTRY OF ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER; DECLARATION OF H. JOSEPH NOURMAND RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE A

Minute Order -

4/19/2012: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/20/2012: Minute Order -

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2012
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Docketat 09:05 AM in Department 37; (Motion Hearing; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 37; (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING ON RECEIVER CARL PETTAS MOTION TO DISCHARGE RECEIVER, APPROVE RECEIVERS FINAL ACCOUNTING & REPORT, EXONERATE BOND AND SURCHARGE CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK FOR RECEIVERS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 86; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketORDER AFTER HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL ACCOUNTING, EXONERATION OF BOND AND ORDER TO SURCHARGE CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANK FOR RECEIVERS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by California Business Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION OF CARL G. PETA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by California Business Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFF, CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BANKS NOTICE AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CARL PETTA AS RENTS RECEIVER; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by California Business Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JANE AUERSWALD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT CARL PETTA AS RECEIVER AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Business Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT - PROMISSORY NOTE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Business Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where MER ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORMANDIN TOM R.