This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 16:08:17 (UTC).

BYEONG JIN YU VS NAM CHO ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2013 BYEONG JIN YU filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NAM CHO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and RONALD M. SOHIGIAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1149

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YU BYEONG JIN

Defendants and Respondents

CHO NAM

DOES 1 TO 20

MUTUAL BUILDING MIANTENANCE INC.

RELIABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE INC.

CHO NAM AKA NAM MIN CHO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BECK PETER LAW OFFICES OF

LEE MICHAEL S.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BIGGINS CHAD ESQ.

KIM JACLYN J.

GARCIA AARON F. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGEMENT

3/5/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER AND...) OF 08/27/2020

8/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER AND...) OF 08/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER AND...)

8/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER AND...)

COMPLAINT FOR UNPAID WAGES

6/6/2013: COMPLAINT FOR UNPAID WAGES

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/26/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT NAM CHO AND DEFENDANT RELIABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/8/2013: DEFENDANT NAM CHO AND DEFENDANT RELIABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION.

10/3/2013: ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/25/2014: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order -

8/13/2014: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS PLAINTIFFS JUDGMENT OBJECTION TO [PROPOSED]

9/15/2014: DEFENDANTS PLAINTIFFS JUDGMENT OBJECTION TO [PROPOSED]

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

10/14/2014: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

Minute Order -

6/12/2015: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL

5/5/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL

Minute Order -

8/15/2016: Minute Order -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

8/30/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

8/30/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL FOR RELIABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC.

2/7/2017: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL FOR RELIABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC.

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AARON F. GARCIA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR RELIABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC.

2/17/2017: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AARON F. GARCIA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR RELIABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC.

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 73; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Lodging of Proposed Order and Proposed Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Lodging of Proposed Order and...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Lodging of Proposed Order and...) of 08/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketJudgment ([Proposed] Amended Judgment After Hearing); Filed by Byeong Jin Yu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Nam Cho (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Lodging of Proposed Order and Proposed Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Lodging of Proposed Order and...) of 07/31/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Lodging of Proposed Order and...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment ((Res ID5456)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment (Res ID: 5456))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANT NAM CHO AND DEFENDANT RELIABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketSummons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Byeong Jin Yu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNPAID WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Byeong Jin Yu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC511149    Hearing Date: March 18, 2020    Dept: 73

3/18/20

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

BYEONG JIN YU VS. NAM CHO, ET AL. (BC511149)

PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (filed 1/17/20)

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendant’s opposition papers were filed by the Law Offices of David Won. No substitution of attorney has been filed on behalf of Nam Min Cho. Cho’s counsel of record is unclear, either Jacklyn Kim or Aaron Garcia. The matter is continued to _____________________. Unless a proper substitution of attorney is filed within 15 days, the court will strike the opposition and proceed with the motion.