This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2020 at 15:08:45 (UTC).

BYEONG G KIM ET AL VS CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2009 BYEONG G KIM filed an Other lawsuit against CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HELEN I. BENDIX, CARL J. WEST and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4215

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HELEN I. BENDIX

CARL J. WEST

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM BYEONG G.

KIM PAEK RAN

Defendants

BEVERAGE GROUP INC.

CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK PAUL LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

BINGHAM MCCUTCHEN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2011
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 35; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 35; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Classic Distributing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 35; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Classic Distributing (Defendant); Beverage Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DocketJUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Classic Distributing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS OF DEFENDANT CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING AND BEVERAGE GROUP, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Classic Distributing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Byeong G. Kim (Plaintiff); Paek Ran Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 311; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. UNFAIR COMPETITION; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Byeong G. Kim (Plaintiff); Paek Ran Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING COMPANY is a litigant