This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:47:55 (UTC).

BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY VS ARSUAL INVEST

Case Summary

On 08/27/2015 BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY filed an Other lawsuit against ARSUAL INVEST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4393

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORI

AUTHORI BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT

Defendants

ARSUAL INVESTMENTS

NARINYAN ARMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOBKO PATRICK K.

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT M. SCHOLNICK

SAFARIAN CHOI & BOLSTAND LLP

SCHOLNICK ROBERT M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Notice; Filed by BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ARSUAL INVESTMENTS (Defendant); ARMAN NARINYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • at 2:00 PM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • at 02:00 pm in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Notice; Filed by BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Notice (OF SETTLEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Answer; Filed by ARSUAL INVESTMENTS (Defendant); ARMAN NARINYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Summons; Filed by BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued (- COMPLAINT FOR NUISANCE ABATEMENT, TRESPASS, EJECTMENT, and for INJUNCTIVE RELIEF and DAMAGES - NO FEE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT is a litigant

Latest cases where ARSUAL INVESTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLNICK ROBERT MARTIN