This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2020 at 10:18:03 (UTC).

BURBANK COLLECTION LTD VS JOHNNY BURBANK INC

Case Summary

On 06/24/2010 BURBANK COLLECTION LTD filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JOHNNY BURBANK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0412

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURBANK COLLECTION LTD.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

JOHNNY BURBANK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JABLON ANDREW V. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL BYERTS RE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 10, 2011 TO SHOW CAUSE RE FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/7/2011: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL BYERTS RE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 10, 2011 TO SHOW CAUSE RE FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order -

3/16/2011: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2011
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 28; (Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions; Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MICHAEL BYERTS RE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 10, 2011 TO SHOW CAUSE RE FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Burbank Collection, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Burbank Collection, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 28; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; No Appearance) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 28; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Burbank Collection, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2010
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Burbank Collection, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Burbank Collection, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less