This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2020 at 22:33:01 (UTC).

BURBANK COLLECTION LTD VS JOHNNY BURBANK INC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2010 BURBANK COLLECTION LTD filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JOHNNY BURBANK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1374

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURBANK COLLECTION LTD.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

JOHNNY BURBANK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JABLON ANDREW V. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2010
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Status Conference (Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Burbank Collection, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Burbank Collection, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNNY BURBANK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BURBANK COLLECTION LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JABLON, ANDREW V.