This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 19:59:36 (UTC).

BUILDING, INC CONSTRUCTION VS. DANIEL TEMIANKA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2015 BUILDING, INC CONSTRUCTION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL TEMIANKA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3853

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUILDING INC CONSTRUCTION

Defendants

TEMIANKA DANIEL AN INDIVIDUAL

ZEINAB DABBAH AN INDIVIDUAL

DANIEL TEMIANKA AN INDIVIDUAL

DANIEL TEMIANKA AND ZEINAB DABBAH

DANIEL TEMIANKA AN

ZEINAB DABBAH AN

Cross Plaintiffs

DR. ZEINAB DABBAH AS INDIVIDUAL AND AS

DR. DANIEL TEMIANKA AS INDIVIDUAL AND AS

Cross Defendants

WILLIAM ROBERT HEFNER

BUILDING INC. CONSTRUCTION DBA BUILDING

HEFNER WILLIAM ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENWALD PAULY FOSTER & MILLER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ & LAUBY

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/19/2015: Summons

Legacy Document

5/19/2015: Legacy Document

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/19/2015: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2015: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice

5/19/2015: Notice

Other -

5/29/2015: Other -

Legacy Document

6/5/2015: Legacy Document

Summons

6/5/2015: Summons

Demand for Jury Trial

6/5/2015: Demand for Jury Trial

Legacy Document

6/9/2015: Legacy Document

Other -

6/9/2015: Other -

Legacy Document

6/9/2015: Legacy Document

Request for Judicial Notice

6/29/2015: Request for Judicial Notice

Legacy Document

6/29/2015: Legacy Document

Minute Order

7/27/2015: Minute Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Consolidated-Other (not lead case)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Consolidated-Other (not lead case)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; (Order to Show Cause; Consolidated-Other (not lead case)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Consolidated-Other (not lead case)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department NCGD, John P. Doyle, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Consolidated-Other (not lead case)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-07-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Demurrer (TO COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by AN DANIEL TEMIANKA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by AN DANIEL TEMIANKA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2015
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Notice of Filing of Recorded Notice of Action Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Notice (of OSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less