This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:12:55 (UTC).

BRUCE ALLEN VS OPULENCE MARKETING LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2016 BRUCE ALLEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OPULENCE MARKETING LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8352

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALLEN BRUCE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

SHAH AZZIEM

OPULENCE MARKETING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NEWELL LAW FIRM THE

Defendant Attorney

BOON WILLIAM ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/27/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

4/27/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

8/9/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL? CIVIL

8/9/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL? CIVIL

Unknown

8/17/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

8/18/2016: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLMNT

9/7/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLMNT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL - CIVIL

9/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL - CIVIL

ANSWER TO COMPLMNT

9/7/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLMNT

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

9/11/2016: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

9/11/2016: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

Unknown

9/16/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

10/27/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/12/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNEMNT

7/25/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNEMNT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/25/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Opulence Marketing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Objection Document; Filed by Bruce Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BRUCE ALLEN S OBJECTIONS TO TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Opulence Marketing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Opulence Marketing LLC (Defendant); Azziem Shah (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Bruce Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOON WILLIAM