This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 06:39:44 (UTC).

BRITTANY LATIMORE, ET AL VS FPI MANAGEMENT, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2015 BRITTANY LATIMORE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FPI MANAGEMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5953

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems and Plaintiffs

LATIMORE BRITTANY

KELLEY SHAWN

Defendants

FPI MANAGEMENT INC.

ROEM DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

DOES 1-20

Minors

KELLEY KING

GILLESPIE JAYLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN J.

Defendant Attorneys

GUTHRIE GEORGE A.

REAGAN BARRY J.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/21/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

7/25/2016: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/11/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

5/24/2016: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/10/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

5/10/2016: REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

DEFENDANTS, FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. AND ROEM DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

5/10/2016: DEFENDANTS, FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. AND ROEM DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

4/18/2016: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/5/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by BRITTANY LATIMORE (Plaintiff); JAYLEN GILLESPIE (Legacy Party); KING KELLEY (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A11; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. (Defendant); ROEM DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Answer; Filed by FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH DEFENDANT FPI MANAGEMENT, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2015
  • Summons; Filed by BRITTANY LATIMORE (Plaintiff); JAYLEN GILLESPIE (Legacy Party); KING KELLEY (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Petn & Ord Appointing GAL; Filed by KING KELLEY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Petn & Ord Appointing GAL; Filed by JAYLEN GILLESPIE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by BRITTANY LATIMORE (Plaintiff); SHAWN KELLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN