This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 20:41:47 (UTC).

BRIDGETTE BAUER ET AL VS EQR-VALENCIA LLC

Case Summary

On 02/27/2014 BRIDGETTE BAUER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EQR-VALENCIA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GAIL FEUER, RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN and HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7914

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GAIL FEUER

RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

BAUER BRIDGETTE

BERT DAVID

BERT GRANT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

EQR-VALENCIA LLC

EQUITY APARTMENTS

EQR-VALENCIA LLC AN ILLINOIS

Minor

BAUER TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

JACOBOVITZ VICTOR

MCCLEAN ROY WAYNE

NIELSEN JONATHAN L.

MCCLEAN WAYNE

JACOBOVITZ VICTOR ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NICK JACK CLIFFORD

NICK JACK C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE A. GENERAL NEGLIGENCE B. NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO DISCLOSE LATENT DEFECTS C. NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO PERFORM COVENANT TO REPAIR D. NEGLIGENT REPAIR - E. VIOLATION OF STATU

2/27/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE A. GENERAL NEGLIGENCE B. NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO DISCLOSE LATENT DEFECTS C. NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO PERFORM COVENANT TO REPAIR D. NEGLIGENT REPAIR - E. VIOLATION OF STATU

APPLIC,?J4ON AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT I)F GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

3/11/2014: APPLIC,?J4ON AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT I)F GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

6/12/2014: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/18/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANT EQR - VALENCIA, LLC DBA EQUITY. APARTMENTS

8/26/2014: PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANT EQR - VALENCIA, LLC DBA EQUITY. APARTMENTS

DEFENDANT, EQR-VALENCIA, LLC?S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE

9/2/2014: DEFENDANT, EQR-VALENCIA, LLC?S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF ADDRESS CORRECTION

9/5/2014: NOTICE OF ADDRESS CORRECTION

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2014)

9/9/2014: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2014)

Minute Order

9/9/2014: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF CORRECTION OF NAME GRANT BERK ERRONEOUSLY SPELLED GRANT BERT

4/24/2015: NOTICE OF CORRECTION OF NAME GRANT BERK ERRONEOUSLY SPELLED GRANT BERT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/24/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2016
  • Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (Continue Trial to 7/25/16 Continue FSC to 7/15/16 ) Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Notice (OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney (4 SUB OF ATTY FILED ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • Notice-Ruling Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Notice (OF CORRECTION OF NAME GRANT BERK ERRONEOUSLY SPELLED GRANT BERT ) Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney (OUT-WAYNE MCCLEAN, ESQ. 8 TOTAL SUB OF ATTY FILED ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Notice (OF ADDRESS CORRECTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Motion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR TAYLOR BAUER ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR TAYLOR BAUER GUARDIAN AD LITEM(COPY) ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less