This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:36:36 (UTC).

BRIAN ZIMMERMAN VS. RACE PRECISION MOTORSPORT LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/15/2016 BRIAN ZIMMERMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RACE PRECISION MOTORSPORT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4524

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZIMMERMAN BRIAN

Defendants

SAINES MARCO

RACE PRECISION MOTORSPORT LLC

DOES 1-100

SCHWEITZER ALAN

ROBLES ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERINO ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

KREIS JOHN P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department U; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department U; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department U; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Notice-Order to Show Cause; Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department U; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; OSC-Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Robert Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Robert Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Robert Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Saines, Marco-DISMISSED 2/5/18 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Brian Zimmerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC104524    Hearing Date: October 22, 2020    Dept: U

Having reviewed the moving papers and there being no opposition filed, the Court grants Plaintiff Brian Zimmerman’s motion to enforce settlement pursuant to C.C.P. section 664.6.  The Court will set aside the dismissal entered as to Defendant Robert Robles and will enter judgment against him in the principal amount of $25,750, plus pre-judgment interest of $6,810.30 and attorneys’ fees of $1,552.50, for a total of $34,112.80.   Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of the Court’s ruling.