This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2017 at 11:48:26 (UTC).

BRIAN KIM VS. LOLITA CARRICO

Case Summary

On 06/09/2008 BRIAN KIM filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against LOLITA CARRICO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MINK, MICHAEL S. and JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2725

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MINK, MICHAEL S.

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM BRIAN

Defendant

CARRICO LOLITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCARLETT CARLTON D. ESQ.

KING ALLEN R.

Defendant Attorney

TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2009
  • Writ-Other (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 8/5/08, RETURNED. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Writ-Other (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Abstract of Judgment (ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2008
  • Claim of Right to Possession (and notice of hearing; ) Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2008
  • Writ-Other (WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2008
  • Judgment (Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2008
  • Declaratory Judgment (pursuant to stipulation ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • Exhibit List (amended exhibit list ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • Stipulation (Stipulation re: Jury (civil trials) ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • Stipulation (re: waiving the reporting of jury instructions ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2008
  • Statement (separate statement in support of her motion for summary judgment; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. (prejudgment claim of right to possession; personal svc on 6-10-08; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Proof of Service (by mail on 6-24-08; answer- unlawful detainer and demand for jury trial; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Answer (unlawful detainer ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Request for Trial Setting Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.