This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 01:38:53 (UTC).

BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC VS PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT &

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9185

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC

SILVER BRENT MICHAEL

Defendants and Respondents

PACIFICA DEVELPMENT & CONSTRUCTION FUND

612 N. FULLER LLC

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC

DOES 1-100

DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LESLIE RICHARDS PC

Defendant Attorney

GROSSBART KENNETH S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

2/3/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

2/3/2016: SUMMONS

Proof of Service

3/17/2016: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

3/17/2016: Proof of Service

JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE ON BEHALF OF SPECIALLY APPEARING UNSERVED DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS NON-PARTIES JERRY (GIORA) AGAM, KAREN AGAM AND RAFI HAYON; ETC.

4/8/2016: JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE ON BEHALF OF SPECIALLY APPEARING UNSERVED DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS NON-PARTIES JERRY (GIORA) AGAM, KAREN AGAM AND RAFI HAYON; ETC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/20/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/20/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ERRATA

4/25/2016: NOTICE OF ERRATA

PROOF OF SERVICE (CIVIL)

4/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE (CIVIL)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF LESLIE RICHARDS RE ORDER TO SHOW CASE - DISMISSAL

6/6/2016: DECLARATION OF LESLIE RICHARDS RE ORDER TO SHOW CASE - DISMISSAL

Unknown

6/7/2016: Unknown

Proof of Service

7/8/2016: Proof of Service

Minute Order

7/12/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/21/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

8/30/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION; AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION FUND, LLC; PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL, INC.; AND 612 N. FULLER AVE, LLC

9/8/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION; AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION FUND, LLC; PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL, INC.; AND 612 N. FULLER AVE, LLC

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

10/27/2016: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (MOTION-JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; Tentative Ruling) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • ORDER ON MOTION BY FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL, INC., PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION FUND, LLC; AND 612 N. FULLER AVE, LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Order; Filed by Pacifica Develpment & Construction Fund, (Defendant); Pacifica First National, Inc (Defendant); 612 N. Fuller, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION FUND, LLC; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Brent Silver Construction, Inc (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Brent Silver Construction, Inc (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Brent Silver Construction, Inc (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Brent Michael Silver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 612 N FULLER AVE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant