This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:13:06 (UTC).

BRENT A BRISCOE VS ANGELA JEAN BRISCOE

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 BRENT A BRISCOE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANGELA JEAN BRISCOE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HANSELL, DEAN, SILVERMAN, B. SCOTT and GOULD-SALTMAN, DIANNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1804

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HANSELL, DEAN

SILVERMAN, B. SCOTT

GOULD-SALTMAN, DIANNA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRISOCE BRENT A.

Claimant

PRODUCER-WRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA PENSION PLAN

Respondent

BRISCOE ANGELA JEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KOSLOFF MICHAEL LEWIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • Order - After Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Proof of Service (- Amended ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 7, Hansell, Dean, Presiding; Request for Order - Other - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • RFO/MTN - Attorney Fees (RE attorney fees; other: enforcement of judgment ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 7, Hansell, Dean, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Declaration (of Kent A. Briscoe ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Briscoe, Angela ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 01-21-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • RFO/MTN - Family Law (SSup, Atty Fees - On Behalf of: Respondent: Briscoe, Angela - Hearing Set on 2016-02-23 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Briscoe, Angela - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-14 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (personal by fax doc - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Brisoce, Brent ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 01-14-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Brisoce, Brent ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less