This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 18:58:49 (UTC).

BRENDA KEROLES VS. RAID YOUNIS, SANA YOUNIS...ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 BRENDA KEROLES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAID YOUNIS, SANA YOUNIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1376

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KEROLES BRENDA

GERGES FAYZA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

YOUNIS RAID

YOUNIS SANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHACHTER ROBERT BAILEY

 

Court Documents

Order

7/10/2018: Order

Declaration

7/10/2018: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

7/10/2018: Ex Parte Application

Stipulation

7/10/2018: Stipulation

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/13/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice

8/22/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/24/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/27/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

1/9/2019: Minute Order

Notice

1/16/2019: Notice

Notice

1/22/2019: Notice

Stipulation

4/16/2019: Stipulation

Declaration

4/16/2019: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

4/16/2019: Ex Parte Application

Other -

4/17/2019: Other -

Minute Order

4/17/2019: Minute Order

Notice

4/22/2019: Notice

Order

4/22/2019: Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/22/2019

DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF TRIAL); Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2019

DocketOrder (Continuing Trial Date); Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial Date.) - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019

DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Con...)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019

DocketOther - (Pre Trial Orders); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2019

DocketEx Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial Date); Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2019

DocketStipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date); Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2019

DocketDeclaration (of Robert Schachter re Ex Parte Notice); Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2019

DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
11/14/2016

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by RAID YOUNIS (Legacy Party); SANA YOUNIS (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2016

DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2016

DocketSummons; Filed by RAID YOUNIS (Legacy Party); SANA YOUNIS (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2016

DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by RAID YOUNIS (Legacy Party); SANA YOUNIS (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2016

DocketAnswer; Filed by RAID YOUNIS (Legacy Party); SANA YOUNIS (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2016

DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2016

DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by BRENDA KEROLES (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2016

DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2016

DocketSummons Issued; Filed by null

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2016

DocketComplaint; Filed by null

[+] Read More [-] Read Less