This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2018 at 01:03:49 (UTC).

BRAULIO VERA VS HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 BRAULIO VERA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA, WILLIAM F. FAHEY and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6718

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VERA BRAULIO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

CAMINO REAL FOODS INC.

PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP LLC

STAY SAFE STAFFING INC.

HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MATIAS PATRICIA A. ESQ

HOFFMAN AMY J. ESQ

VOGEL ROBERT D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/12/2016: SUMMONS

Unknown

4/19/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/2/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARINGS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

5/18/2016: NOTICE OF HEARINGS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/18/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC.; STAY SAFE STAFFING, INC.; AND PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP, INC. TO. PLAINTIFF BRAULIO VERA'S COMPLAINT

5/20/2016: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC.; STAY SAFE STAFFING, INC.; AND PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP, INC. TO. PLAINTIFF BRAULIO VERA'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING FROM DEFENDANTS' PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

6/20/2016: NOTICE OF RULING FROM DEFENDANTS' PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Unknown

8/2/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/5/2016: Unknown

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/9/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

8/15/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/7/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/1/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP, LLC

2/15/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP, LLC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATOR1ES, SET TWO; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/6/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATOR1ES, SET TWO; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEFENDANT CAMINO REAL FOODS, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF BRAULIO VERA'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/12/2017: DEFENDANT CAMINO REAL FOODS, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF BRAULIO VERA'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES, ETC

4/19/2017: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES, ETC

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Jury Trial - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (stipulation and order to continue trial date and all related dates and deadlines; ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Answer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Default Entered (CAMINO REAL FOOD, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VACATED PER STIP AND ORDER 4/5/17 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Request to Enter Default (as to Camino Real foods, Inc.,a Calif. corp. reject-#9 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice (REASSIGNED TO SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA) - Case is reassigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less