This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2016 at 19:57:15 (UTC).

BRANDON DAVIS VS DIM MAK STUDIOS ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2014 BRANDON DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DIM MAK STUDIOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9000

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DAVIS BRANDON

Defendants and Respondents

DIM MAK RECORDS

DIM MAK STORES INC. THE

DOES 1 TO 50

DWG INTERNATIONAL INC.

FLIX ENTERTAINMENT INC.

DIM MAK STUDIOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WALSH JR. JOSEPH M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/16/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

3/14/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

1/20/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DWG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

1/2/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DWG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/3/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/3/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/3/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/3/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/3/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

9/29/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

9/29/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

03/16/2016

DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire Action w/prej.; ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2015

DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2015

DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2014

DocketProof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2014

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less