This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2016 at 00:16:05 (UTC).

BRANDON BOREN VS EUGENE GOLLING ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2013 BRANDON BOREN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against EUGENE GOLLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE O'DONNELL, RICHARD FRUIN, ROBERT H. O'BRIEN, KEVIN C. BRAZILE and RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1386

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE O'DONNELL

RICHARD FRUIN

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOREN ALLAN

BOREN BRANDON

Defendants and Respondents

AFSHAR AMIR

ANODIZING INDUTRIES INC.

GOLLING EUGENE

GOLLING STEPHAN

GOLLING TIFFANY

PACDAN COMPANY

DOES 1-20

HADDAD HENRY G.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ANODIZING INDUTRIES INC.

GOLLING EUGENE

GOLLING STEPHAN

GOLLING TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TESSER & RUTTENBERG

MILES L. KAVALLER

TESSER & RUTTENBERG & GROSSMAN LLP

DANIEL S. GOTTESMAN

KULIK GOTTESMAN & SIEGEL LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GROSSMAN BRIAN M. ESQ.

ROGER M. ROSEN

BECKER BARTLEY L. ESQ.

MENDLIN JOYCE S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT HENRY HADDAD?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA M. GUERIN

5/23/2013: DEFENDANT HENRY HADDAD?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA M. GUERIN

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/31/2013: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

6/24/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

NOTICE OF RULING

7/5/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

Unknown

7/9/2013: Unknown

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT HENRY HADDAD?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING THE HEARING ON HIS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC.

8/7/2013: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT HENRY HADDAD?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING THE HEARING ON HIS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC.

Minute Order

8/28/2013: Minute Order

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO EUGENE GOLLING?S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

10/16/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO EUGENE GOLLING?S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PROTECTIVE ORDER

10/28/2013: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PROTECTIVE ORDER

DEFENDANT HENRY HADDADS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? THIRD AMENDED COM PLAINT

10/29/2013: DEFENDANT HENRY HADDADS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? THIRD AMENDED COM PLAINT

DEFENDANTS AND CROSS- COMPLAINANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM ASSERTING CLAIMS FOR DAMAGES ALLEGEDLY SUFFERED BY PACDAN COMPANY AT TRIAL DEFENDANT AND CROSSCOMPLAINANTS?

12/10/2013: DEFENDANTS AND CROSS- COMPLAINANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM ASSERTING CLAIMS FOR DAMAGES ALLEGEDLY SUFFERED BY PACDAN COMPANY AT TRIAL DEFENDANT AND CROSSCOMPLAINANTS?

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL FOR ONE COURT DAY; DECLARATION OF ROGER M. ROSEN

1/16/2014: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL FOR ONE COURT DAY; DECLARATION OF ROGER M. ROSEN

PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS- DEFENDANTS? OBJECTION TO ORDER RE DECLARATORY RELIEF AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF CAUSES OF ACTION FOLLOWING BIFIJRCATED TRIAL [PROPOSED]

2/21/2014: PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS- DEFENDANTS? OBJECTION TO ORDER RE DECLARATORY RELIEF AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF CAUSES OF ACTION FOLLOWING BIFIJRCATED TRIAL [PROPOSED]

PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ORDERS RE PERMANENT INJUNCTION ETC.

2/27/2014: PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ORDERS RE PERMANENT INJUNCTION ETC.

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/3/2014: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

1/21/2015: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

6/19/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

7/13/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

390 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2015
  • Abstract of Judgment (mail ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Notice (of order correcting prior minute order nunc pro tunc ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs ($2,356.00 (HENRY HADDAD) COSTS ENTERED 08/21/15 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 08/21/15 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs ($23,188.79 COSTS WAS PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. SEE JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/01/15 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 08/11/15 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT ON THE GOLLING PARTIES' CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Request for Correction (APPLICATION FOR CORRECTION OF MINUTE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF ALLAN BOREN'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
253 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2013
  • Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Proof of Service (of opposition docs to osc re p.i. ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Opposition Document (to osc re preliminary injunction ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Objection Document (to evidence ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Declaration (OF HADDAD IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE P.I. ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Opposition Document (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Ex-parte Request for Order Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

/) e e e X 8§@ I &8 & o @ 0O R O

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

BRANDON BOREN, an individual; and ALLAN BOREN, an individual,

Plaintiffs,

JUDGMENT ON THE GOLLING PARTIES’ CROSS-COMPLAINT [EBROPOSED}-

TRIAL DATE: June 29, 2015 TIME: 9:30 a.m. DEPT: 15

EUGENE GOLLING, an individual; STEPHAN GOLLING, an individual; TIFFANY GOLLING, an individual; AMIR AFSHAR, an individual; ANODIZING INDUSTRIES, INC., a California corporation; PACDAN COMPANY. a California corporation; and DOES 1-20, inclusive,

Defendants.