This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 21:22:56 (UTC).

BONNIE VERONESE VS ROTHMAN FOOD GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2016 BONNIE VERONESE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ROTHMAN FOOD GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6097

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VERONESE BONNIE

Defendants and Respondents

ROTHMAN FOOD GROUP LLC

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GILLAM LAW FIRM APLC THE

LAW OFFICE OF STEVEN ELSTER

GILLAM CAROL

ELSTER STEVEN STONE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART

TRESSLER LLP

LANGHAMMER CARL EDWARD JR

 

Court Documents

Other -

8/21/2018: Other -

Other -

8/21/2018: Other -

Minute Order

8/22/2018: Minute Order

Other -

9/4/2018: Other -

Other -

9/14/2018: Other -

Minute Order

9/21/2018: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/21/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Other -

9/25/2018: Other -

Other -

9/25/2018: Other -

Unknown

5/1/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

11/15/2016: Minute Order

Order

1/21/2017: Order

Stipulation and Order

10/3/2017: Stipulation and Order

Declaration

10/6/2017: Declaration

Order

10/6/2017: Order

Opposition

11/13/2017: Opposition

Ex Parte Application

11/13/2017: Ex Parte Application

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/14/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Informal Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere thread - TO HON. CAROLYN KUHL: Request for Informal Telephone Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • at 1:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Class Certification - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (of entire case); Filed by Bonnie Veronese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice (of ruling on plaintiff's motion to compel depositions and for monetary sanctions); Filed by Bonnie Veronese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Rothman Food Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Rothman Food Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2016
  • Status Report; Filed by Rothman Food Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Rothman Food Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bonnie Veronese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • at 4:30 PM in Department 323; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-02-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Bonnie Veronese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL PERIODS (CAL. LABOR CODE 226.7 & 512; I.W.C. WAGE ORDER 5-2001); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.