This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 00:08:36 (UTC).

BON VIVANT HOA VS. BATIA ZELIG, AS TRUSTEE & DOES 1-50

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 BON VIVANT HOA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BATIA ZELIG, AS TRUSTEE DOES 1-50. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4750

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BON VIVANT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

DOES 1-50

BATIA ZELIG AS TRUSTEE OF THE BATIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WISNICKI NORMAN STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

ISAACS BARAK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Bon Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department W; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Bon Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department W; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department W; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Bon Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department W; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bon Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Batia Zelig, as Trustee of The Batia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Bon Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Bon Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Miscellaneous; Filed by Bon Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BON VIVANT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant