This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 00:00:24 (UTC).

BOCATIJA FAMILY TRUST VS. EVELYN B. CARLES

Case Summary

On 10/18/2016 BOCATIJA FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EVELYN B CARLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8589

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOCATIJA FAMILY TRUST BY GLENN CORRIENTE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EVELYN B. CARLES

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

CARLES EVELYN B.

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Trustees

GLENN CORRIENTE BOCATIJA

BOCATIJA GLENN CORRIENTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUSINESS AND LAW CENTER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MATHEWS NORMAN A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (1) OSC RE RE SANCTIONS AGAINSTPLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL FORFAILURE TO APPEAR ON 6/28/17;OR2) OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TOPROSECUTE;) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION *DISMISSAL SIGNED OFF BY PLTF'S ATTORNEY & X-DEFT'S ATTORNEY, NORMAN MATTHEWS); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by BOCATIJA FAMILY TRUST BY GLENN CORRIENTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Court Order - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Notice; Filed by EVELYN B. CARLES (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Notice (OF POST MEDIATION CONFERENCE & TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by EVELYN B. CARLES (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by EVELYN B. CARLES (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (EVELYN B. CARLES VS. BOCATIJA FAMILY TRUST BY GLENN BACATIJA AS TRUSTEE; GLENN BOCATIJ A; ARLEEN ROJAS; WILMA C. BOCATIJA ALRED M. BOCATIJA; ESTER C. BOCATI); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by BOCATIJA FAMILY TRUST BY GLENN CORRIENTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less