This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 06:33:40 (UTC).

BMT LLC VS ANDRE VILLEROY ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/16/2013 BMT LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ANDRE VILLEROY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUIS A. LAVIN and ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8708

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUIS A. LAVIN

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BMT LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

ELIPSE MODERN INC.

G5 CAPITAL PARNERS LLC

HARFIELD DAVID

JP MORGAN CHASE N.A.

VILLEROY ANDRE

IGWT CONSULTING LLC - DOE 1

DAMON VICKIE - DOE 3

COSBY BRANDI - DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHAFFER GOLD & RUBAUM LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BABAK HASHEMI

BRETT D. WATSON

WATSON BRETT D.

HASHEMI BABAK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2016
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 48; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 48; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by BMT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; Court Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BMT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
378 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF BMT LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJ INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF BMT LLCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATIONS OF EDWARD TORRES, BRAN DI COSI3Y AND BARRY I. GOLI), ESQ. IN SUPPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketEx-parte Request for Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BMT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF BMT LLCS COMPLAINT FOR: 1) SPECIFIC RECOVERY OF PROPERTY; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HASHEMI BABAK LAW OFFICES OF

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON BRETT D.