This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 15:49:20 (UTC).

BLANCA M. BARRERA, ET-AL VS. ROSA GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 03/14/2013 BLANCA M BARRERA, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROSA GUERRERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7328

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRERA BLANCA M.

Defendants

GUERRERO ROSA

DOES 1 TO 30

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAKKAK Z. DEAN LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

DIETZ ALISEDA & ASSOCIATES

WATTEN DISCOE BASSETT & MCMAINS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/27/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/25/2013: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

3/18/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/25/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

4/14/2014: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/14/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Unknown

7/26/2013: Unknown

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

10/3/2013: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BLANCA M. BARRERA?S RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; ETC

1/22/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BLANCA M. BARRERA?S RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; ETC

ANSWER OF ROSA GUERRERO TO COMPLAINT

6/13/2013: ANSWER OF ROSA GUERRERO TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

7/22/2013: Unknown

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/22/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BLANCA M. BARRERA?S RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; ETC

1/22/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BLANCA M. BARRERA?S RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KAREN BARRERA?S RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; ETC

1/22/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KAREN BARRERA?S RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; ETC

MINUTE ORDER

8/7/2013: MINUTE ORDER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Motion to Compel (PLTF, BLANCA, TO SPECIAL INTERROGS SET TWO; REQ FOR SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney (THE COURT AND ALL PARTIES ARE NOTIFIED THAT ROSA GUERRERO MAKES THE FOLLOWING SUBSTITUTION; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Motion to Compel (PLTF, KAREN'S, RESPONSES TO SP. INTERROGS, SET ONE; REQ FOR SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Motion to Compel (PLTF, BLANCA'S, RESPONSES TO SP. INTERROGS, SET ONE; REQ FOR SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (ROSA GUERRERO ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.