This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 23:39:35 (UTC).

BLANCA E GALUAN VS VICEAT HERNANDEZ ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2015 BLANCA E GALUAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VICEAT HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN, MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT, YOLANDA OROZCO, LAURA A. MATZ and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2053

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. MATZ

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALVAN BLANCA E

GALVAN BLANCA E.

Defendants and Respondents

HERNANDEZ EMILY

HERNANDEZ VICENT

HERNANDEZ EMELY

HERNANDEZ VICEUT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SHEAFFER NEIL R. ESQ.

SKAJA DANIELS LISTER PERMITO LLP

SHEAFFER NEIL RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

7/12/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

12/23/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NTC TO PRTY RE FEE CLK'S TRANSCPT

3/9/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NTC TO PRTY RE FEE CLK'S TRANSCPT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-09-11 00:00:00

9/11/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-09-11 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-02-20 00:00:00

2/20/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-02-20 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM - OTHER

4/10/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM - OTHER

Notice of Ruling

5/11/2018: Notice of Ruling

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/1/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

6/1/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

Notice of Ruling

6/6/2018: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF APPEAL

8/8/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF APPEAL

Request For Copies

9/7/2018: Request For Copies

Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT CLARIFICATION(NOTICE OF APPEAL)

10/25/2018: Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT CLARIFICATION(NOTICE OF APPEAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)]

3/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)]

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

7/12/2016: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

8/18/2016: NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

DECLARATION REG. SERVICE

6/6/2017: DECLARATION REG. SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

144 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Judgment) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgment) of 11/15/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketMotion to Vacate (Judgment); Filed by Blanca E. Galvan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
264 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketDesignation of Record on Appeal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Blanca E. Galvan (Plaintiff); BLANCA E. GALVAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC602053    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: E

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

Date: 1/15/19

Case: Blanca E. Galvan v. Vincent Hernandez, et al. (BC 602053)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Blanca E. Galvan’s Motion to Vacate Judgment is not considered by the Court, as there is no proof of service showing the papers were served on the other parties to this action. (See CCP §1010; 1005 (b); CRC Rule 3.1300 (a), (c).) It also appears that plaintiff appealed the Court’s judgment and thereafter filed the instant motion before any remittitur was issued by the Court of Appeal and/or received by this Court. As such, the relief sought in the instant motion is also subject to the stay on appeal. (See CCP § 916. [“The perfecting of an appeal stays proceedings in the trial court upon the judgment . . . “].) Finally, as a substantive matter, the motion fails to identify under what legal authority the motion is made or how plaintiff is legally entitled to relief sought therein. (See CRC Rule 3.1112(a)(3); CRC Rule 3.1113(b) [“The memorandum must contain a statement of the facts, a concise statement of the law, evidence and arguments relied on, and a discussion of the statutes, cases, and textbooks cited in support of the position advanced”].)