This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 23:52:59 (UTC).

BERTHA RODRIGUEZ ET AL VS GIOVANNI D'AMORE ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2014 BERTHA RODRIGUEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GIOVANNI D'AMORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6521

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GONZALES ADOLFO

GONZALES IVAN

GONZALES ROCIO

GUTIERREZ RUBEN

LARA MARA

RODRIGUEZ BERTHA

JIMENEZ LETICIA

GONZALES JOSE

PACHECO LIZCETT

SANCHEZ BARTOLO

JUAREZ CECILIA

GUEVARA GUILLERMINA

HIDAGO ROSIBEL

VALDEZ MERCEDES

CISNEROS PRISCILIANA

VELA HECTOR

Defendants and Respondents

D'AMORE GIOVANNI

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

INCOME ESTATES LLC

MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP THE

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ELDER & SPENCER LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR LAW O/O

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

5/17/2017: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Conference-Informal Discovery; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Bertha Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Monarch Family Limited Partnership, The (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Bertha Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Ruben Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Mara Lara (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Bertha Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Ruben Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Mara Lara (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Bertha Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bertha Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Ruben Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Mara Lara (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE HABITABILE MOBILE HOME PARK; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A is a litigant

Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant