This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2019 at 22:38:31 (UTC).

BERNARDS BROS INC VS LAND MARK ELECTRIC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/22/2014 BERNARDS BROS INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against LAND MARK ELECTRIC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN J. GOODMAN and ROLF M. TREU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9978

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

ROLF M. TREU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BERNARDS BROS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

B & M CONTRACTORS INC.

CENTURY WEST PLUMBING INC.

IMAC CONSTRUCTION INC.

LAND MARK ELECTRIC INC.

SMI ARCHITECTURAL MILLWORK INC.

TINCO SHEET METAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SKANE WILCOX LLP

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 1281, ET SEQ

7/22/2014: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 1281, ET SEQ

SUMMONS

7/23/2014: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/30/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/30/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/15/2014: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Proof of Service

9/4/2014: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/4/2014: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/4/2014: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/4/2014: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/4/2014: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/4/2014: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF GREG SIMONS IN SUPPORT OF PETII1ONER BERNARDS.BROS. INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/4/2014: DECLARATION OF GREG SIMONS IN SUPPORT OF PETII1ONER BERNARDS.BROS. INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; (

9/4/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; (

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; [PROPOSED] OR

9/4/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; [PROPOSED] OR

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POTNTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/4/2014: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POTNTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. KAHN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BERNARD BROS. INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/4/2014: DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. KAHN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BERNARD BROS. INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

AMENDED PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; [PRO

9/5/2014: AMENDED PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; [PRO

Unknown

9/15/2014: Unknown

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference (Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DECLARATION OF ANA ALAS FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE DECEMBER 7, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference (Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATIONS OF BRIAN D. KAHN AND GREG SIMONS; (PROPOSED] ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1281, ET SEQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B&M CONTRACTORS (ROE 1)...... is a litigant

Latest cases where LAND MARK ELECTRIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where IMAC CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TINCO SHEET METAL INC. is a litigant