This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 16:18:38 (UTC).

BERNARD PARLANGE VS BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB INC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2016 BERNARD PARLANGE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9557

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PARLANGE BERNARD

Defendant and Respondent

BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TURRILL MICHAEL L.

ANDERSON ALLAN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

MCMILLEN JEFFREY BRIAN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE AND AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 2024.050 & CRC 3.1200, ET SEQ., FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM I

12/5/2017: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE AND AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 2024.050 & CRC 3.1200, ET SEQ., FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM I

NOTICE OF PREVIOUSLY FILED REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION AND CONTINUED REQUEST

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF PREVIOUSLY FILED REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION AND CONTINUED REQUEST

Minute Order

4/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/9/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF STEPHANE BACRIE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

8/8/2018: DECLARATION OF STEPHANE BACRIE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

8/8/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS E. HEWLETT, JR. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

8/29/2018: DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS E. HEWLETT, JR. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/6/2018: BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Declaration

10/30/2018: Declaration

Reply

11/2/2018: Reply

SUMMONS

5/5/2016: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANGE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC.'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/15/2016: PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANGE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC.'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/20/2017: BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

4/12/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANCE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/23/2017: PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANCE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANGE'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, SET ONE

11/30/2017: PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANGE'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, SET ONE

DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS E. HEWLETTT, JR. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, SET ONE

12/1/2017: DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS E. HEWLETTT, JR. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, SET ONE

PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANGE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

12/4/2017: PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANGE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B292853); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED 09/21/18); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (Re: Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Strike and/or Tax Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs); Filed by Bernard Parlange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Motion to Strike ((Legacy)) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Ruling Re: Motion Strike or Tax Costs by Defendant Beverly Hills Car Club; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Strike)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Reply (to Further Declaration in Opposition to the Motion of Defendant to Strike and or Costs of Plaintiff); Filed by Beverly Hills Car Club, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Appeal Bond; Filed by Beverly Hills Car Club, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
233 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC'S REPLY TO BERNARD PARLANGE'S OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF BERNARD PARLANGE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DECLARATION OF JEFFREY B. MCMILLEN UNDER CCP 430.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Demurrer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF A FOREIGN-COUNTRY JUDGMENT (CCP 1715(A), 1718(A)),; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Bernard Parlange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

1||JEFFREY B. McMILLEN, Esq.

The Law Offices of JEFFREY B. McMILLEN 2(>5909 pala, Suite 310

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

BERNARD PARLANGE, an

individual Assigned to for all purposes

to Department 24; Hon Robert L Hess

PLAINTIFF, -

CASE NO. BC619557 BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC.,

a California Corporation, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR

SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SECOND

17 Defendants. AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

[FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH 19 SPEPARATE STATEMENT OF 20 UNDISPUTED FACTS AND DECLARATION

OF JEFFREY B. MCMILLEN]

21 DATE : 8-4-~-17

22 TIME: 8:30A.M.

DEPT. 24

RES. ID# 170411210509 !///

NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that on August 4, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., or

as soon thereafter as the matter may be heard in Department 24 of the above named court Defendant, BEVERLY HILLS CAR CLUB, INC.

(“Defendant”) will move the_quft for entry .of a Summary Judgment