This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2018 at 10:43:03 (UTC).

BERDECIA, ANGEL A VS RODRIGUEZ, MARIA J

Case Summary

On 01/21/2016 BERDECIA, ANGEL A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, MARIA J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1701

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERDECIA ANGEL A

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ MARIA J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel - Filed and Entered on 2016-06-02 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketJudgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel - Filed and Entered on 2016-06-02 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel - Filed and Entered on 2016-06-02 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketMilestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-05-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final decl of disc - On Behalf of: Respondent: Rodriguez, Maria ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (blank FL105,FL140,FL142,FL150 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketMilestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-25-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel - Granted on 2016-01-21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketNotice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketPetition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berdecia, Angel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less