This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:22:45 (UTC).

BENORE BLACKMON VS KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2016 BENORE BLACKMON filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7827

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BLACKMON BENORCE

Respondents and Defendants

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC.

KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Other

GARDNER NANCY L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BELGUM & FRY

BELGUM FRY & VAN ALLEN

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

GIOVANNIELLO ALEXANDER F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/22/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KINDRED HEALTHCA

12/22/2017: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KINDRED HEALTHCA

DECLARATION OF TANYA L. PROUTY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUI?HERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KIND

12/22/2017: DECLARATION OF TANYA L. PROUTY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUI?HERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KIND

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THE EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KI

12/22/2017: NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THE EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KI

DECLARATION OF CAROLINA CACHU IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KINDRED

12/22/2017: DECLARATION OF CAROLINA CACHU IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KINDRED

MOTION IN LIMINE TO (1) LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S RECOVERY OF NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES TO $250,000 AND ETC

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO (1) LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S RECOVERY OF NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES TO $250,000 AND ETC

MOTION IN LIMINE TO BIFURCATE: (1)TRIAL OF LIABILITY; AND(2) DAMAGES, INCLUDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION I

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO BIFURCATE: (1)TRIAL OF LIABILITY; AND(2) DAMAGES, INCLUDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION I

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF STATE OR REGULATORY SURVEYS, STATEMENTS OF DEFICIENCY, PLANS OF CORRECTION, ETC

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF STATE OR REGULATORY SURVEYS, STATEMENTS OF DEFICIENCY, PLANS OF CORRECTION, ETC

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ALL EXPERTS AND EXPERT OPINIONS NOT PROPERLY DISCLOSED PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 2034.010, ET. SEQ. ETC

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ALL EXPERTS AND EXPERT OPINIONS NOT PROPERLY DISCLOSED PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 2034.010, ET. SEQ. ETC

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT POSITED BY PLAINTIFFS BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15]

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT POSITED BY PLAINTIFFS BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING ON CUMULATIVE MATTERS BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION IN LIMINE N

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING ON CUMULATIVE MATTERS BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION IN LIMINE N

MOTION IN LIMINE FOR 24-HOUR DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES PRIOR TO PRESENTATION AT TRIAL BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE FOR 24-HOUR DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES PRIOR TO PRESENTATION AT TRIAL BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES NOT FURNISHED OR PRODUCED IN RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOT

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES NOT FURNISHED OR PRODUCED IN RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOT

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO THE EFFECT OF WELDATE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE 15657, CIVIL CODE 3333.2 OR ETC

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO THE EFFECT OF WELDATE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE 15657, CIVIL CODE 3333.2 OR ETC

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO THE EXISTENCE OF INSURANCE BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10]

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO THE EXISTENCE OF INSURANCE BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT EXPERT OPINION TO TESTIMONY GIVEN AT DEPOSITION BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9]

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT EXPERT OPINION TO TESTIMONY GIVEN AT DEPOSITION BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY AMOUNTING TO CRITICISMS THAT DO NOT CONSTITUTE A BREACH OF THE STANDARD OF CARE BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN

12/29/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY AMOUNTING TO CRITICISMS THAT DO NOT CONSTITUTE A BREACH OF THE STANDARD OF CARE BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KINDRED HEALTHCARE

12/29/2017: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY AND KINDRED HEALTHCARE

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (RE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BEDISMISSED AFTER SETTLEMENT) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Motion in Limine (numbers 1 through 18 ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Notice of Ruling (RE EXPARTE APP FOR AN ORDER CONT. TRIAL ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. dba KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLYE AND KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF TANYA L. PROUTY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL BY DEFENDANTS. ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2016
  • Declaration (OF TRIAL COUNSEL ALEXANDER F GIOVANNIELLO ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Notice (OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Receipt-Depository; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • First Amended Complaint (demand for jury ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Notice of Motion (for order appointing benorce blackmon as succesor in interest ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant