This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2016 at 13:23:30 (UTC).

BENNY PATRICK VS. TORRANCE MEORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2009 BENNY PATRICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TORRANCE MEORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK S. ARNOLD and CARY NISHIMOTO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9823

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK S. ARNOLD

CARY NISHIMOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

POTTS NATALIE

PATRICK BENNY

Defendants

TORRANCE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC(DOE 21)

DELILLY JULIE M.D.

CORREDOR JUAN M.D.

NAKATA MICHAEL M.D.

NAKAGAWA JOE M.D.

NAGHI BENI M.D.

MIRHASHEMI RAMIN M.D.

BOLD EDWARD M.D.

TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

ATAMDEME FIKRET M.D.

Minor

PATRICK BRIONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

MICHELS & WATKINS

Defendant Attorneys

BLESSEY TAYLOR

BOYCE WILLIAM R. ESQ.

BRANDMEYER KENT T. ESQ.

FESLER DON

HASKINS ANGELA S.

NAHRA JOHN P.

PETERSON GEORGE

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD &

SCHMID & VOILES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2010
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • Request for Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • Declaration (OF LESVIA M. ALVARADO, ESQ ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Petition (TO APPROVE MINOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • OSC-Failure to File Req for Dism Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • Notice of Settlement (AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • Ex-Parte Application ( TO CONT TRIAL **TRIAL 06-29-10 CONT 08-23-10 **FSC/OSC 06-17-10 CONT 08-12-10 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • Motion in Limine (NOS 1-5 ARE FILED CONCURRENTLY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Notice (THAT PETITION OF DEFENDANT BENI NAGHI, M.D. FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION BETWEEN THE ARBITRATING PARTIES ONLY AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFFSS TO ARBITRATE THE CONTROVERSY HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CAL) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: FIKRET ATAMDEDE, M.D. SUB SERVED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: JUAN CORREDOR, M.D. SUB SERVED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: EDWARD BOLD, M.D. SUB SERVED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: MICHAEL NAKATA, M.D. SUB SERVED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: BENI NAGHI, M.D. SUB SERVED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER SUB SERVED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • Application - misc (APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRANCE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant