This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 11:30:48 (UTC).

BENJAMIN MAGGID ET AL VS JAMES ZAMPULLA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2012 BENJAMIN MAGGID filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JAMES ZAMPULLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7825

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MAGGID BENJAMIN

MAGGID RANDI

Defendants and Respondents

D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC.

KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY INC.

ZAMPULLA JAMES

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HARTMANN RONALD A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CARLSON MARK C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMI3LAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

1/26/2012: COMI3LAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/15/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/15/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (I) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, ETC

4/11/2012: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (I) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, ETC

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/11/2012: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

N01?TCE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR DEFENDANTS D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (SUED HEREIN AS D?AMICO PALOS VERL)ES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES

4/25/2012: N01?TCE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR DEFENDANTS D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (SUED HEREIN AS D?AMICO PALOS VERL)ES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES

DEFENI)ANTS D?AMJCO PALOS `ERDES REALTY, INC. DRA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (SUED HCRCIN AS I)?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC.) AND JAMES ZAMPUL

5/8/2012: DEFENI)ANTS D?AMJCO PALOS `ERDES REALTY, INC. DRA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (SUED HCRCIN AS I)?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC.) AND JAMES ZAMPUL

Minute Order -

5/11/2012: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO FAC

6/14/2012: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO FAC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/15/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

REPLY OF DEFENDANTS I)?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (SUED HCREIN AS D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DRA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC.) AND JAME

6/20/2012: REPLY OF DEFENDANTS I)?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (SUED HCREIN AS D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DRA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC.) AND JAME

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/29/2012: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD FRAUD NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION NEGLIGENCE

7/17/2012: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD FRAUD NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/17/2012: SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS D?AMICO PALOS VEIIDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES I REALTY (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS I D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS I VERDES REA

7/20/2012: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS D?AMICO PALOS VEIIDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES I REALTY (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS I D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS I VERDES REA

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/10/2012: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

8/22/2012: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

9/13/2012: Minute Order -

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 48; Court Order (Court Order; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Benjamin Maggid (Plaintiff); Randi Maggid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 48; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by James Zampulla (Defendant); D'Amico Palos Verdes Realty, Inc. (Defendant); Keller Williams Palos Verdes Realty, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketAnswer to Second Amended Complaint; Filed by James Zampulla (Defendant); D'Amico Palos Verdes Realty, Inc. (Defendant); Keller Williams Palos Verdes Realty, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANTS D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAN1S PA LOS VERDIS REALTY SUED HEREIN AS DAMICO IALOS VERI)ES REALTY, INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC.) AND JAMES ZANIPULLAS NOTICE )F DENIURRER AND DEMURRER TO IHE COMPLAINT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Benjamin Maggid (Plaintiff); Randi Maggid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Benjamin Maggid (Plaintiff); Randi Maggid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Benjamin Maggid (Plaintiff); Randi Maggid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketCOMI3LAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLSON MARK C. ESQ.