This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2018 at 10:44:00 (UTC).

BENJAMIN JAVAHERIAN, ET AL VS. HAMID KELISHADI, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2011 BENJAMIN JAVAHERIAN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against HAMID KELISHADI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, HUEY P. COTTON and MICHAEL HARWIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5593

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

HUEY P. COTTON

MICHAEL HARWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL AS SHAREHOLDERS DERIVATIVELY ON BEHAL

APILAN A NEVADA CORPORATION

DELP CHRIS

JAVAHERIAN BENJAMIN

VUKMIROVICH ERIC

ZAGHI FARSHAD

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

KELISHADI HAMID

NULINX INTERNATIONAL INC.

TOOL CIRCLE INC. DBA APILAN

TOOL CIRCLE INC. DBA APILAN A NEVADA CO

KOHANFARS HAMID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUMPHREY JEFFREY SCOTT

ABEL DAVID BRETT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KESHAVARZI MOE

KRISHEL DANIEL LEE

SALISIAN NEAL S.

WHITE KENNETH PAUL

PENNELL JONATHAN M.

Other Attorneys

O'CONNOR ROBERT TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

5/14/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/13/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/13/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF H. HAN PAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT HAM II) KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOI-IANARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY

6/13/2013: DECLARATION OF H. HAN PAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT HAM II) KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOI-IANARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR

6/13/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR

DECLARATION OF NEAL S. SALISIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIO

6/13/2013: DECLARATION OF NEAL S. SALISIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIO

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR

6/13/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR

DECLARATION OF H. HAN PAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SAN

6/13/2013: DECLARATION OF H. HAN PAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SAN

DECLARATION OF NEAL S. SALISIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

6/13/2013: DECLARATION OF NEAL S. SALISIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

DECLARATION OF NEAL S. SALISIAN. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONET

6/13/2013: DECLARATION OF NEAL S. SALISIAN. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONET

DECLARATION OF H. HAN PAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANC

6/13/2013: DECLARATION OF H. HAN PAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANC

DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTEROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC

6/13/2013: DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTEROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC

DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE, RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY

6/13/2013: DEFENDANT HAMID KELISHADI?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT HAMID KOHANFARS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE, RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY

MOTION/ OPPOSITION/ STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO: INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

6/14/2013: MOTION/ OPPOSITION/ STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO: INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

MOTION / OPPOSITION / STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

6/24/2013: MOTION / OPPOSITION / STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

6/24/2013: MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

Minute Order

6/24/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

11/10/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Judgment ((AMENDED) ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Reply (PLAINTIFF'S SURREPLY AND EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO CORRECTED (PROPOSED) AMENDED JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Reply (SURREPLY & EVIDENTIARY OBJEC. TO DEF.' RESPONSE TO PLNT.'S OBJEC. T TO CORRECTED AMENDED JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Objection (TO CORRECTED [PROPOSED] AMENDED JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Notice (Notice of Filing of Proposed Amended Judgment ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Miscellaneous (HAMID KELISHADI AND NULINX INTERNATIONAL, INC'S ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT CCP 673 & 681.020 ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Remittitur (REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 1/25/17 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • at 01:30 pm in Department NWM, MICHAEL HARWIN, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2012
  • Request-Judicial Notice; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • Declaration (OF MOE KESHAVARZI IN SUPP OF MTN FOR AN ORDER CMOPELLING PLTFS TO FURNISH A BOND PURS TO CORPS CODE 800(c) ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • Declaration (OF ADOLFO MUNOZ IN SUPP OF MTN FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLTFS TO FURNISH A BOND PURS TO CORPS CODE 800(c) ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • Stipulation & Order (EXT DEFT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO 2-24-12 ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • Stipulation & Order (EXT DEFT'S TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR PLT'S TO FURNISH BOND FROM 1-18-12 TO 2-17-12 ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • Declaration-Diligence; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'CONNOR ROBERT TIMOTHY