This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 20:16:39 (UTC).

BENJAMIN HARB VS AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/12/2016 BENJAMIN HARB filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0511

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HARB BENJAMIN

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES MARTIME INC

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JEREMY PASTERNAK APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CASEY DEMIAN

JOHN M. WHELAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

8/12/2016: SUMMONS

CIVIL COMPLAINT 1. CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE; ETC

8/12/2016: CIVIL COMPLAINT 1. CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/20/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/17/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/17/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/20/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

1/26/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF FOR THE FEBRUARY 10, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/30/2017: PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF FOR THE FEBRUARY 10, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

1/30/2017: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Unknown

2/7/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

2/10/2017: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/28/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

4/24/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MULTIPLE DOCUMENTS

6/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF MULTIPLE DOCUMENTS

DECLARATION OF ASHLEE CHERRY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; EXHIBITS A-D

6/2/2017: DECLARATION OF ASHLEE CHERRY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; EXHIBITS A-D

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES GENERAL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

6/2/2017: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES GENERAL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET ONE

6/2/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET ONE

DECLARATION OF ASHLEE CHERRY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; EXHIBITS A-D

6/2/2017: DECLARATION OF ASHLEE CHERRY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; EXHIBITS A-D

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Benjamin Harb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 12; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 12; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Benjamin Harb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE TO OTHER CIVIL ACTIONS BROUGHT BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MULTIPLE DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Benjamin Harb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Benjamin Harb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Benjamin Harb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • CIVIL COMPLAINT 1. CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASEY DEMIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN M. WHELAN ESQ.