This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:21:21 (UTC).

BENJAMIN E VEGA VS ERICK PARRA

Case Summary

On 02/05/2016 BENJAMIN E VEGA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ERICK PARRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9475

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VEGA BENJAMIN E.

Defendants and Respondents

PARRA ERICK

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

RULING RE:REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ERIC PARRA

4/4/2018: RULING RE:REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ERIC PARRA

BRIEF STAEMENT OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO CRC 3-1800

5/24/2018: BRIEF STAEMENT OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO CRC 3-1800

COVER SHEET FOR EXHIBITS

5/24/2018: COVER SHEET FOR EXHIBITS

DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN VEGA PURSUANT TO SECTION 585(D)

5/24/2018: DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN VEGA PURSUANT TO SECTION 585(D)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/24/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK

6/1/2018: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK

Abstract of Judgment?Civil and Small Claims

1/28/2019: Abstract of Judgment?Civil and Small Claims

Unknown

4/23/2019: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/5/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/15/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/12/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/12/2017: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

6/15/2017: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/20/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/21/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

8/30/2017: Minute Order

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Affidavit of Identity and Order; Filed by Benjamin E. Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Benjamin E. Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Brief ; Filed by Benjamin E. Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • BRIEF STAEMENT OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO CRC 3-1800

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • COVER SHEET FOR EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN VEGA PURSUANT TO SECTION 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Benjamin E. Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Benjamin E. Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC609475    Hearing Date: July 21, 2020    Dept: 29

Vega v. Parra BC609475

The hearing on the Motion to Set Aside/ Vacate Default and Default Judgment on Tuesday, July 21, 2020 will be treated as a pre-hearing status conference. No witness testimony will be heard on July 21, 2020; to the extent that the parties intend to offer oral testimony, the evidentiary hearing will be held at a later date that will be set at the hearing. Counsel are encouraged to appear telephonically or by video conference for the pre-hearing status conference, and should be prepared to address:

(1) Does either side intend to present live witnesses or are the parties prepared to rely on the declarations?

(2) If the parties intend to present witness testimony, do they intend to present them in person, in the courtroom, or remotely? Does either side have objections to witnesses appearing telephonically?

(3) If either party is planning to present witnesses in person, how many witnesses does the party plan to call? What is the total number of people (including lawyers, parties and witnesses) that you expect to be present in the courtroom?

(4) If counsel and witnesses intend to appear remotely, how will the introduction of exhibits be handled?

If both sides are prepared to rely on the written submissions and do not intend to offer any live testimony, the Court will hear argument on the merits of the motion on July 21, 2020. If either side wishes to offer oral testimony, the evidentiary hearing will be continued to a mutually agreeable date to be set at the pre-hearing status conference.

The court will give notice.