This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2016 at 08:49:41 (UTC).

BENJAMIN ADAMS VS ALEJANDRO MORENO

Case Summary

On 05/21/2012 BENJAMIN ADAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEJANDRO MORENO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SIRNA, SALVATORE T. and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3891

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SIRNA, SALVATORE T.

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS BENJAMIN

Defendants

MORENO ALEJANDRO JOSE

MORENO JUAN MORENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

GIBBS PATRICK J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/24/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/26/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

ORDER RE: UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS

5/3/2013: ORDER RE: UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS

Minute Order

5/3/2013: Minute Order

UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFEREN

5/3/2013: UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFEREN

NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

5/6/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/12/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE__ ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Order (RE: UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES (UNOPPOSED) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • Order (GRANTING LEAVE TO INTERVENE ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • Complaint in Intervention Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH