This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2016 at 21:19:08 (UTC).

BEHNAZ BABAKNIA VS ROCKCREATION INC

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 BEHNAZ BABAKNIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROCKCREATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1488

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

11/21/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

11/21/2016: COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

12/14/2016: Substitution of Attorney

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT, ROCKREATION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/10/2017: DEFENDANT, ROCKREATION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

11/16/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CONTACT INFORMATION

11/16/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CONTACT INFORMATION

CIVIL DEPOSIT

11/16/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DECLARATION OF NICOLE M. SLATTERY IN SUPPORT OF ROCKREATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/21/2017: DECLARATION OF NICOLE M. SLATTERY IN SUPPORT OF ROCKREATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ROCKREATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/21/2017: ROCKREATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF BLAINE EASTCOTT IN SUPPORT OF ROCKREATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/21/2017: DECLARATION OF BLAINE EASTCOTT IN SUPPORT OF ROCKREATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ROCKREATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/21/2017: ROCKREATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ROCKREATIONS'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/21/2017: ROCKREATIONS'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF ERIN GUINN IN SUPPORT OF ROCKREATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/21/2017: DECLARATION OF ERIN GUINN IN SUPPORT OF ROCKREATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ROCKREATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/21/2017: ROCKREATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC641488    Hearing Date: September 17, 2020    Dept: P

 

Tentative Ruling

Behnaz Babaknia v. Rockcreation, Inc., Case No. BC641488

Hearing Date September 17, 2020

Defendant Rockcreation’s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Plaintiff sustained injury at defendant Rockreation’s rock-climbing facility. Plaintiff agreed to settle for $45,000 from Rockcreation, which seeks determination of a good faith settlement.

“Any party to an action in which it is alleged that two or more parties are joint tortfeasors or co-obligors . . . shall be entitled to a hearing on the issue of the good faith of a settlement entered into by the plaintiff or other claimant and one or more alleged tortfeasors or co-obligors[.]” Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. §877.6(a)(1). A determination that the settlement was in good faith bars any joint tortfeasor or co-obligor from any further claims against the settling tortfeasor for equitable contribution or indemnity. Id. at (c). The court considers factors including the settlor’s proportionate liability, amount paid, allocation of settlement proceeds, a recognition that a settlor should pay less in settlement than if he were found liable after trial, the financial condition and insurance policy limits of the settling defendants and evidence of collusion, fraud or tortious conduct aimed to injure the interests of non-settling parties. Tech-Bilt, Inc. v. Woodward-Clyde & Assoc. (1985) 38 Cal.3d 488, 493-494.

Rockcreation argues settlement complies with Tech-Bilt, arguing plaintiff’s waiver precludes a finding of liability at trial and lack of evidence of fraud or collusion.

Co-defendant C.A.M.P. USA does not dispute the amount but argues the settlement should be allocated between economic and non-economic damages. Rockcreation notes an allocation made in connection with a settlement is non-binding at trial, pursuant to Gouvis Engineering v. Superior Court (1995) 37 Cal.App.4th 642. As this is the state of the law, allocation between economic and non-economic damages is unnecessary. GRANTED.

DUE TO THE COVID-19 PANDEMIC, PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO APPEAR REMOTELY VIA LA COURT CONNECT.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS