This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 03:42:35 (UTC).

BEAZLEY INSURANCE OCMPANY INC VS REFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCT

Case Summary

On 07/22/2013 BEAZLEY INSURANCE OCMPANY INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against REFERRAL DESIGN CONSTRUCT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5993

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEAZLEY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

REFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC.

VANIS RICHARD W. JR. ESQ.

UZI LEVY INC.

ALL SYSTEMS FIRE PROTECTON INC ROE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHURAN AMY M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

7/22/2013: SUMMONS -

SUBROGATION COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

7/22/2013: SUBROGATION COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/4/2013: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

9/4/2013: REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC. FOR: 1) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; ETC

9/4/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC. FOR: 1) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; ETC

SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/19/2013: SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/8/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

UZI LEVY, INC. DBA CORE FIRE PROTECTION?S ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

10/29/2013: UZI LEVY, INC. DBA CORE FIRE PROTECTION?S ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

UZI LEVY, INC. DBA CORE FIRE PROTECTION?S CROSS COMPLAINT

10/30/2013: UZI LEVY, INC. DBA CORE FIRE PROTECTION?S CROSS COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/30/2013: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS ON CROSS-COM

11/15/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS ON CROSS-COM

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

11/19/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

11/20/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

REFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S ANSWER TO UZI LEVY, INC. DBA CORE FIRE PROTECTION?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/21/2013: REFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S ANSWER TO UZI LEVY, INC. DBA CORE FIRE PROTECTION?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT THERE TO

2/19/2014: SUMMONS ON ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT THERE TO

REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS.COMPLAINT

2/19/2014: REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS.COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/6/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ALLSYSTEMS FIRE PROTECTION, INC. FOR: (1) IMPLIED EQUITABLE INDEMNITY (2) TOTAL EQUITABLE INDEMNITY (3) CONTRIBUTION AND PARTIAL INDEMNITY (4) DECLARATORY RELIEF (5) APPORTIONMENT O

3/27/2014: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ALLSYSTEMS FIRE PROTECTION, INC. FOR: (1) IMPLIED EQUITABLE INDEMNITY (2) TOTAL EQUITABLE INDEMNITY (3) CONTRIBUTION AND PARTIAL INDEMNITY (4) DECLARATORY RELIEF (5) APPORTIONMENT O

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 98; (OSC RE Dismissal; Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Uzi Levy Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Referral Design & Construction, Inc. (Legacy Party); Richard W. Jr. Esq. Vanis (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Referral Design & Construction, Inc. (Legacy Party); Richard W. Jr. Esq. Vanis (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Referral Design & Construction, Inc. (Legacy Party); Richard W. Jr. Esq. Vanis (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketREFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, INC. FOR: 1) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • DocketSUBROGATION COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA GREEN PROS is a litigant

Latest cases where UZI LEVY INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHURAN AMY MARIE