This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 21:25:06 (UTC).

BEACON INVESTMENT CO. VS. KILKEA GROUP, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 BEACON INVESTMENT CO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KILKEA GROUP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3361

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEACON INVESTMENT CO.

CRENSHAW LUMBER CO.

Defendants

BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC.

DOES 1-10

KILKEA GROUP INC.

SILVER BRENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIS JEFFREY ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • (Request-Dismissal); Filed by Beacon Investment Co. (Plaintiff); Crenshaw Lumber Co. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Beacon Investment Co. (Plaintiff); Crenshaw Lumber Co. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Beacon Investment Co. (Plaintiff); Crenshaw Lumber Co. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Beacon Investment Co. (Plaintiff); Crenshaw Lumber Co. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Beacon Investment Co. (Plaintiff); Crenshaw Lumber Co. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Beacon Investment Co. (Plaintiff); Crenshaw Lumber Co. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Beacon Investment Co. (Plaintiff); Crenshaw Lumber Co. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Beacon Investment Co. (Plaintiff); Crenshaw Lumber Co. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Crenshaw Lumber Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIS JEFFREY A.