This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:58:05 (UTC).

BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES LLP VS CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/10/2015 BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES LLP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4824

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES LLP

Defendant

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SASSOON SALES

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/3/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

6/15/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

6/11/2015: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/21/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

3/10/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/10/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Barry Mason Enterprises LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; (OSC-Failure to 'OTHER'; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 20; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Barry Mason Enterprises LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Barry Mason Enterprises LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant