This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2016 at 04:34:33 (UTC).

BARBARA LEAR VS THE VONS COMPANIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2012 BARBARA LEAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE VONS COMPANIES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. MILTON, ADR NEUTRAL, JOHN P. DOYLE and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8216

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. MILTON

ADR NEUTRAL

JOHN P. DOYLE

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEAR BARBARA

Defendants

7UP

DR. PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP INC.

DR. PEPPER/7UP BOTTLING CO. OF THE WEST

SAFEWAY INC.

VONS COMPANIES INC.

7UP-RC BOTTLING COMPANY OF SO. CALIF.

THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY

Cross Defendants

7UP/RC BOTTLING CO.

SEVEN-UP/RC BOTTLING COMPANY INC.

Not Classified By Court

AWAD AKRAM A. ESQ.

Other

GOLDHAMMER HARVEY L. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PASSOVOY PAUL S.

Defendant Attorneys

YOUNGERMAN & MCNUTT LLP

ROBINSON DI LANDO & WHITAKER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FSC AND TRIAL DATES

5/7/2013: NOTICE OF FSC AND TRIAL DATES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/13/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/20/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/13/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/30/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/26/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE/TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES; AND ORDER

3/26/2014: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE/TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES; AND ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

6/18/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

6/18/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

REPORT TO COURT BY THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY REGARDING STATUS OF DISCOVERY

4/24/2013: REPORT TO COURT BY THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY REGARDING STATUS OF DISCOVERY

Unknown

4/9/2013: Unknown

NOTICE OF FILING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT THE VONS COMPANIES, INC.

3/6/2014: NOTICE OF FILING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT THE VONS COMPANIES, INC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/6/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/26/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

10/28/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2014
  • Notice of Hearing on Petition Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; AS TO PLAINTIFF, BARBARA LEAR, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF, ALLIANCE OF SCHOOLS FOR COOPERATIVE INS. PROGRAMS, CASE NO. EC058217 ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Partial Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE/TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES; AND ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Notice of Filing (SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • Notice (OF FSC AND TRIAL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Report-Status Filed by Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2012
  • Partial Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT AS TO SAFEWAY, INC. ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Notice-Related Cases (EC058217 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.